MD HB881 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing an institution of higher education, a related medical facility, or an affiliated biomedical research firm to file with the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission a registration to purchase medical cannabis for the purpose of conducting a bona fide research project relating to the medical uses, properties, or composition of cannabis; providing that a certain registration is valid until there is a change in a certain project or there is a withdrawal of the registration; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Academic Research - Medical Uses and Properties of Cannabis

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateRereferred to Judicial Proceedings
2019-04-05SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments {536181/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-02-13HouseHearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback