MD HB883 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a certain presumption may be rebutted if a certain commissioner or court finds and states on the record at a certain time that adhering to certain limits would create a certain risk to certain individuals; authorizing a certain commissioner or court to take certain actions on finding that adhering to certain limits would create a certain risk to certain individuals; requiring the State's Attorney, rather than the court, to send a certain notice to a certain victim at the victim's last known address; etc.
Title
Justice Reinvestment Act - Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (112-28) (Y: 113 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (112-28) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {382319/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary and Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Adultery
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Courts
Criminal Law - Procedure
Equipment
Fines
Hearings
Licenses
Local Government Mandates
Notices
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Petitions
Prisoners
State's Attorneys
Substance Abuse
Victims
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Courts
Criminal Law - Procedure
Equipment
Fines
Hearings
Licenses
Local Government Mandates
Notices
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Petitions
Prisoners
State's Attorneys
Substance Abuse
Victims