MD HB889 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 634
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 634
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting from the property tax property that is owned by the Maryland Farm Bureau, Inc., and used exclusively for education of the public, encouraging agriculture in the State, assisting in the dissemination of information relating to agriculture, or the maintenance of a natural or recreational area for public use; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2020; etc.
Title
Property Tax - Exemption - Maryland Farm Bureau, Inc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 634 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2020-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-15 | House | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Moon) Adopted |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2020-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB802 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 635
Subjects
Agriculture
Education
Exemptions
Farmland
Local Government Mandates
Property Tax
Sports and Recreation
Taxes - Property
Education
Exemptions
Farmland
Local Government Mandates
Property Tax
Sports and Recreation
Taxes - Property
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 7 | 246 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |