MD HB891 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding the application of provisions of law governing grievance procedures for certain employees; requiring a grievant to complete certain forms in sufficient detail that will allow for the expeditious resolution of the grievance; applying a certain definition of "grievance" to a certain requirement that the Department of Transportation adopt certain regulations relating to employee grievance procedures; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Personnel - Grievance Procedures

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (97-37) (Y: 97 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-14) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (97-38) (Y: 98 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (97-37)
2019-04-08HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (32-14)
2019-04-08SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-08SenateFavorable with Amendments {597675/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-08SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (97-38)
2019-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-14HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback