MD HB894 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a Microbusiness Payment Pilot Program to expedite payments to certain microbusinesses under a State procurement contract for supplies or services made by or on behalf of the Historic St. Mary's City Commission or St. Mary's College of Maryland; requiring a certain unit to make a payment under a certain procurement contract to a microbusiness not later than 7 days after the payment becomes due; etc.
Title
State Procurement - Microbusiness Payment Pilot Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2020-03-02 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-05 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Historical Matters
Procurement
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Small Business
State Government - Procurement
State Universities and Colleges
Sunset
Time
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Historical Matters
Procurement
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Small Business
State Government - Procurement
State Universities and Colleges
Sunset
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 15 | 113 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |