MD HB895 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an accredited hospital to fill a prescription for and dispense a prescription drug that contains a Schedule III controlled dangerous substance and was prescribed at another accredited hospital in the State.
Title
Hospitals - Prescription Drugs - Dispensing of Schedule III Drug Prescriptions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2019-03-12 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Drugs
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Hospitals
Medical Treatments
Drugs
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Hospitals
Medical Treatments