MD HB896 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of the Environment to establish and administer a statewide green business certification program; requiring the green business certification program to recognize businesses operating in a way that reduces their environmental footprint and to provide consumers with information how to identify those businesses; requiring the Department to update and enhance the statewide green business certification program in consultation with the Montgomery County Green Business Certification Program; etc.
Title
Environment - Statewide Green Business Certification Program - Establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 105 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (105-33) |
2020-03-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {380615/1 Adopted |
2020-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Certifications
Commerce and Business
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Rules and Regulations
Time
Commerce and Business
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Rules and Regulations
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 1 | 901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |