MD HB898 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a trustee to provide notice to a person under the Maryland Trust Act by first-class mail, personal delivery, or delivery to the person's delivery address; requiring a trustee to receive authorization in writing from a person entitled to receive notice before providing notice by first-class mail, postage prepaid, by a certain facsimile transmission or e-mail; authorizing a person to revoke a trustee's authorization to provide notice by an alternative method; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trusts - Maryland Trust Act - Methods of Notice

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24HouseVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-15SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {266986/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback