MD HB899 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting the Motor Vehicle Administration from renewing the registration of a motor vehicle if the applicant has not submitted a motor vehicle safety and equipment inspection certificate; requiring certain motor vehicles to complete a safety and equipment inspection; requiring under certain circumstances the inspection to be completed and the inspection certificate submitted to the Administration before the registration of a vehicle may be renewed; establishing that the maximum amount of the fee for the inspection is $20; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Biennial Motor Vehicle Safety and Equipment Inspections - Required

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
2019-02-25HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback