MD HB909 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-09 - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations and Judiciary)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-09 - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations and Judiciary)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a system for adjudication of a claim involving a birth-related neurological injury; providing for certain benefits and compensation, of a claimant under the Act; establishing the Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund to provide compensation and benefits to eligible claimants; providing for certain premiums and insurance surcharges to be used to finance and administer the Fund; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations and Judiciary) |
2018-02-09 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary |
Subjects
Administrative Hearings, Office of
Civil Actions and Procedures
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Damages
Health
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Investigations and Inquiries
Medical Malpractice
Midwives
Nurses
Physicians
Revenue and Taxes
Civil Actions and Procedures
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Damages
Health
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Investigations and Inquiries
Medical Malpractice
Midwives
Nurses
Physicians
Revenue and Taxes