MD HB915 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to set a fee, by regulation, for specified services of the Advance Directive Registry; and requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to take the steps necessary to make the Registry operational on or before October 1, 2014.
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Advance Directive Registry - Fee and Date of Operation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn |
2013-03-08 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Advance Medical Directives
Fees
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Public Health
Registration
Rules and Regulations
Fees
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Public Health
Registration
Rules and Regulations