MD HB916 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to study and make specified recommendations regarding harvesting hard-shell clams in the Atlantic Coastal Bays; requiring the Department to identify areas in the Chincoteague Bay that are restricted from being used under an aquaculture lease; requiring the Department to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2016; etc.
Title
Study on Harvesting Hard-Shell Clams in the Atlantic Coastal Bays and Aquaculture Areas in the Chincoteague Bay
Sponsors
Del. Jay Jacobs [R] | Sen. Mary Carozza [R] | Del. Andrew Cassilly [R] | Del. Kevin Hornberger [R] |
Del. Seth Howard [R] | Sen. Johnny Mautz [R] | Del. Charles Otto [R] | Del. Teresa Reilly [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2016-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {840311/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2016-02-26 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m. |
2016-02-26 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-02-26 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m. |
2016-02-11 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-02-26 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Aquaculture
Boats and Ships
Clams
Coastal Bays
Dredging
Equipment
Fish and Fishing
Hunting and Fishing
Licenses
Natural Resources, Department of
Reports
Boats and Ships
Clams
Coastal Bays
Dredging
Equipment
Fish and Fishing
Hunting and Fishing
Licenses
Natural Resources, Department of
Reports