MD HB923 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 705
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Task Force to Study Transportation Access for the purpose of reviewing certain information, findings, and recommendations to improve transportation access; requiring the Task Force to make a final report of its findings to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2021; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Task Force to Study Transportation Access

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (104-32) (Y: 104 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (100-39) (Y: 101 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 705
2019-04-08HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (104-32)
2019-04-08HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2019-04-08SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-08SenateFavorable with Amendments {887371/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-08SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (100-39)
2019-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {760415/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0923&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0923f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0923t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0923e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_705_hb0923e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/hb0923_76041501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/hb0923_88737101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0003/hb0923.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0923_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0734.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0923_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1575.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1376.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback