MD HB924 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-7)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 445
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-7)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 445
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a licensed physician, under certain circumstances and in accordance with certain regulations, to delegate certain duties to a registered cardiovascular invasive specialist assisting in the physician's performance of a fluoroscopy; establishing that the hospital in which a certain laboratory is located and the physician delegating the acts are responsible for ensuring that certain requirements are met; authorizing the State Board of Physicians to impose a certain civil penalty of up to $5,000; etc.
Title
State Board of Physicians - Registered Cardiovascular Invasive Specialists
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 445 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2019-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {126181/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-02-18 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Data
Ethics
Examinations
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Job Training
Laboratories
Licenses
Medical Schools
Penalties and Sentences
Physicians
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Data
Ethics
Examinations
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Job Training
Laboratories
Licenses
Medical Schools
Penalties and Sentences
Physicians
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset