MD HB93 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 536
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing the $3,000 cap on the amount that will be awarded for a scholarship under the Walter Sondheim Jr. Public Service Internship Scholarship Program to $5,000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Walter Sondheim Jr. Public Service Internship Scholarship Program - Repeal of Award Cap

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 536
2019-04-03HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-04-03HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
2019-03-28SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-28SenateFavorable with Amendments {834930/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-28SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-08SenateHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-14HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-02-12HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-12HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-11HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-01-22HouseHearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-22HouseHearing canceled
2019-01-22HouseHearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-18HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0093&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0093f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0093t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0093e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_536_hb0093e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/hb0093_83493001.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0003/hb0093.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0093_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0077.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0093_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0946.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1201.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback