MD HB930 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a hospital, if the hospital is seeking to close, partially close, downsize, merge, or delicense and workers may be displaced, to provide at least 90 days' notice to certain entities, a certain community, and affected workers; providing for the content of a certain notice; requiring approval by the Maryland Department of Health, the Maryland Health Care Commission, and the Health Services Cost Review Commission before a hospital closes, partially closes, downsizes, merges, or is delicensed under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Hospitals – Changes in Status – Notification and Approval
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2019-02-26 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-13 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 3:00 p.m. |
2019-02-13 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-13 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Data
Examinations
Health
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Health, Department of
Hospitals
Notices
Records
Reports
Work, Labor and Employment
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Data
Examinations
Health
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Health, Department of
Hospitals
Notices
Records
Reports
Work, Labor and Employment