MD HB932 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 498
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 498
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a trustee to divide a trust into two or more separate trusts or consolidate two or more trusts into a single trust if a beneficiary does not object in writing within 30 days after the trustee provided notice; and requiring a trustee to divide a trust into two or more separate trusts or consolidate two or more trusts into a single trust in a certain manner.
Title
Maryland Trust Act - Division or Consolidation of Trust
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 498 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {646583/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-02-18 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |