MD HB939 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing certain classes of electric bicycles; establishing that electric bicycles may be operated in any place where bicycles are allowed to travel, subject to certain restrictions; prohibiting a person under the age of 16 years from operating a Class 3 electric bicycle on a public highway; requiring manufacturers of electric bicycles to apply a certain label in a certain manner to each electric bicycle beginning January 1, 2020; requiring electric bicycles to comply with federal regulations; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycles - Equipment and Operation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2019-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {410418/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Bicycles
Committees and Commissions
Federal Government
Fuel
Highways
Jurisdiction
Labeling
Minors
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Safety
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Bicycles
Committees and Commissions
Federal Government
Fuel
Highways
Jurisdiction
Labeling
Minors
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Safety
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road