MD HB94 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to accept an application for an accidental disability retirement allowance from certain individuals within 3 years after the individuals' retirement; requiring that the accidental disability retirement allowance begin on a certain day under certain circumstances; and terminating the Act after June 30, 2020.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Accidental Disability Retirement Application
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2019-01-22 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-22 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-01-22 | House | Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-18 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Accidents
Administrative Agencies
Baltimore City
Beneficiaries
Committees and Commissions
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Mental and Behavioral Health
Retirement Systems
Signs and Billboards
Social Workers
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Sunset
Support of Dependents
Teachers
Time
Witnesses
Workers' Compensation
Administrative Agencies
Baltimore City
Beneficiaries
Committees and Commissions
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Mental and Behavioral Health
Retirement Systems
Signs and Billboards
Social Workers
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Sunset
Support of Dependents
Teachers
Time
Witnesses
Workers' Compensation