MD HB94 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 50
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 50
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Limiting a statutory exception to the common-law rule against perpetuities that provides that the rule does not apply to an option of a tenant to purchase all or part of the premises leased by the tenant to an option that is exercisable only during the term of the lease; and providing for the prospective application of the Act.
Title
Estates and Trusts - Rule Against Perpetuities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 50 |
2020-03-16 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2020-02-18 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-17 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2020-01-14 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB152 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 51
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Estates and Trusts | 11 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |