MD HB940 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (41-3)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (41-3)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Health Services Cost Review Commission to conduct a study, in conjunction with the Maryland Health Care Commission and certain stakeholders, on the feasibility and desirability of allowing for an unregulated space in a hospital operating room as a pilot project; and requiring the Health Services Cost Review Commission to report to the Senate Finance Committee and the House Health and Government Operations Committee by June 30, 2020, on the results and findings of the study.
Title
Unregulated Space in Hospital Operating Suites Pilot Project – Study
Sponsors
Del. Terri Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (41-3) (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (41-3) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Floor Amendment {963528/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Hearing 4/08 at 2:00 p.m. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-04-02 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2019-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2019-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-29 | House | Favorable with Amendments {536180/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-02-13 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 3:00 p.m. |
2019-02-13 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-13 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Boundaries
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Data
Education
Examinations
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Hospitals
Medical Assistance
Medical Treatments
Patients
Physicians
Prices
Public Information
Reports
Sunset
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Data
Education
Examinations
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Hospitals
Medical Assistance
Medical Treatments
Patients
Physicians
Prices
Public Information
Reports
Sunset