MD HB942 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 381
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 381
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying certain provisions of law pertaining to a certain reemployment earnings offset of a retirement allowance for certain retirees of the State Retirement and Pension System that are reemployed in certain positions.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Reemployment Earnings Offset - Clarification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 381 |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2020-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {494766/1 Adopted |
2020-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2020-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-05 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB809 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 382
Subjects
Retirement
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Work, Labor and Employment
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 22 | 406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 23 | 407 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 24 | 405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 25 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 27 | 406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |