MD HB945 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing a record owner of a certain new dwelling to claim a credit against the State income tax in an amount equal to $1.25 for each square foot of the new dwelling if a certain automatic fire sprinkler system is installed in the new dwelling; requiring the State Fire Marshal to approve applications for the credit in a certain manner; limiting the total amount of credits that may be approved to $1,000,000 in any taxable year; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018; etc.
Title
Income Tax Credit - New Dwellings - Automatic Fire Sprinkler Systems
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn |
2019-03-06 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-12 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |