MD HB946 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-22 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-22 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the purpose of the Address Confidentiality Program for victims of domestic violence to include enabling shelters for victims of domestic violence to maintain confidentiality of the actual locations of the shelters; and prohibiting an operator of a Web site, search engine, or mobile application from publishing, disseminating, or otherwise disclosing the actual location of a shelter for victims of domestic violence under specified circumstances.
Title
Domestic Violence - Confidentiality of Locations of Shelters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-22 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn |
2016-02-12 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-10 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Business Regulation and Occupations
Crimes and Punishments
Domestic Violence
Family Law
Fines
Housing
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Victims
Crimes and Punishments
Domestic Violence
Family Law
Fines
Housing
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Victims