MD HB946 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-8)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 508
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-8)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 508
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a carrier to provide to an insured under a policy or contract of long-term care insurance a certain contingent benefit upon lapse under certain circumstances; providing that certain benefits of a certain policy or contract of long-term care insurance shall remain unchanged and may not be increased after a certain date; and applying the Act.
Title
Long-Term Care Insurance - Contingent Benefit Upon Lapse
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 508 |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-04-04 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2018-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-03-30 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-30 | House | Favorable with Amendments {406688/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-30 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Claims
Consumer Price Index
Contracts
Counties
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
Long-Term Care
Municipal Corporations
Prices
Time
Claims
Consumer Price Index
Contracts
Counties
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
Long-Term Care
Municipal Corporations
Prices
Time