MD HB947 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 385
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 385
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the State Board of Dental Examiners to issue a cease and desist order for certain violations; increasing certain penalties for certain acts related to the unauthorized practice of dentistry or dental hygiene; altering from a misdemeanor to a felony certain penalties for violating certain provisions of law related to dental laboratory work or advertising a dental appliance; etc.
Title
Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist Orders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 385 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2020-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {326083/1 Adopted |
2020-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-05 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-05 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB169 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 386
Subjects
Advertising
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Crimes and Punishments
Dental Hygienists
Dentists
Equipment
Ethics
Fines
Health Occupations
Laboratories
Medical Malpractice
Medical Treatments
Penalties and Sentences
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Crimes and Punishments
Dental Hygienists
Dentists
Equipment
Ethics
Fines
Health Occupations
Laboratories
Medical Malpractice
Medical Treatments
Penalties and Sentences
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 4 | 321 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 4 | 606 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |