MD HB95 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 753
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 753
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that an advanced practice registered nurse is not precluded from delegating a nursing or other technical task to an assistant under certain circumstances; providing that a registered nurse or a licensed practical nurse is not precluded from delegating a technical task other than a nursing task to an unlicensed individual under certain circumstances; and requiring the State Board of Nursing to adopt certain regulations.
Title
Health Occupations – Nurses – Delegation of Tasks
Sponsors
Del. Susan Krebs [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 753 |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2021-02-18 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-17 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-12-23 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2020-10-15 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB476 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 754
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Health Occupations
Job Training
Managers and Supervisors
Nurses
Nursing Assistants
Rules and Regulations
Work, Labor, and Employment
Health Occupations
Job Training
Managers and Supervisors
Nurses
Nursing Assistants
Rules and Regulations
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 8 | 6A-02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |