MD HB952 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 201
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 201
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Continuing the State Board of Cosmetologists in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2024, the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Board; and requiring that an evaluation of the Board and the statutes and regulations that relate to the Board be performed on or before December 15, 2021.
Title
State Board of Cosmetologists - Sunset Extension
Sponsors
Del. The Speaker [?] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 201 |
2019-03-29 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-12 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-11 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-02-08 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Business Regulation and Occupations
Committees and Commissions
Cosmetologists
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Committees and Commissions
Cosmetologists
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset