MD HB954 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the Secretary of Agriculture from adopting regulations to establish or impose a per ton inspection fee on commercial compost distributed by a private entity in the State.
Title
Agriculture - Commercial Compost - Prohibition on Per Ton Inspection Fee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178 |
2019-03-29 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {780611/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Commerce and Business
Fees
Fertilizers
Industry and Technology
Inspections
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Weights and Measures
Agriculture, Department of
Commerce and Business
Fees
Fertilizers
Industry and Technology
Inspections
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Weights and Measures