MD HB956 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Division of Labor and Industry in the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to collect and retain a specified civil penalty rather than have the penalty paid into the General Fund; requiring a contractor to pay specified liquidated damages for late submission of payroll records to the Division and not to the General Fund; requiring a contractor to pay specified liquidated damages for failing to pay a specified laborer or employee the prevailing wage to the Division and not to the General Fund; etc.
Title
Prevailing Wage Enforcement Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters Withdrawn |
2014-02-26 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-06 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Construction
Contractors
Contracts
Damages
Fraud
Labor and Industry, Division of
Penalties and Sentences
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Procurement
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Procurement
Work, Labor and Employment
Contractors
Contracts
Damages
Fraud
Labor and Industry, Division of
Penalties and Sentences
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Procurement
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Procurement
Work, Labor and Employment