MD HB959 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-06 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City, when determining whether a license should be renewed and, if so, whether any conditions should be attached, to consider the performance of a license holder for the 4 years immediately before the date of the renewal application; prohibiting the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City or a certain license holder in the City from allowing a person under the age of 21 years to enter a certain establishment except under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages – License Renewals and Adult Entertainment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-2) (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-06HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-04-06HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (44-2)
2019-04-04SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments {444734/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-19SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {133691/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2019-02-08HouseHearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0959&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0959f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0959t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0959e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0959_13369101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0959_44473401.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0009/hb0959.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0959_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0753.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0959_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1425.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1208.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback