MD HB96 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a certain dealer or other person from loaning a regulated firearm to a certain borrower under certain circumstances; prohibiting a certain dealer or other person from selling, renting, loaning, or transferring a regulated firearm to a certain person who the dealer or other person knows or has reason to believe intends to use the regulated firearm to commit a crime or cause harm to the purchaser, lessee, transferee, or recipient or another person; creating a certain exception; etc.
Title
Public Safety – Regulated Firearms – Prohibition of Loans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (88-44) (Y: 88 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2019-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (88-44) |
2019-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-28 | House | Special Order until 03/29 (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments {722019/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2019-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 10:00 a.m. |
2019-01-18 | House | First Reading Judiciary |