MD HB962 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Rereferred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program, subject to the limitations of the State budget, to provide coverage for any medically appropriate drugs that are approved by the United States Food and Drug Administration for the treatment of hepatitis C, regardless of the fibrosis score, and that are determined to be medically necessary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Coverage - Hepatitis C Drugs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-04-05SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2019-04-04HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-04HouseFavorable with Amendments {396081/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-04HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-02-19HouseHearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback