MD HB968 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a party to a gestational carrier agreement to file a petition for parentage under specified circumstances; establishing the purposes of the Act; specifying the required contents of a petition for parentage; requiring a court to issue an order of parentage under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Family Law - Collaborative Reproduction - Orders of Parentage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-17 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-15 | House | Reassigned to Judiciary |
2016-02-10 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Attorneys
Circuit Courts
Contracts
Family Law
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Interstate Affairs
Jurisdiction
Paternity
Petitions
Privacy
Records
Vital Records
Attorneys
Circuit Courts
Contracts
Family Law
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Interstate Affairs
Jurisdiction
Paternity
Petitions
Privacy
Records
Vital Records