MD HB97 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 596
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 596
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing and empowering the County Commissioners of St. Mary's County to borrow not more than $33,000,000 in order to finance the construction, improvement, or development of certain public facilities in St. Mary's County, and to effect such borrowing by the issuance and sale at public or private sale of its general obligation bonds; etc.
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 596 |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2020-01-17 | House | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-17 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-14 | House | Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-13 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB261 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Subjects
County and Baltimore City Bonds
County Commissioners
Local Debt (Bond Bills)
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Debt
Revenue and Taxes
St. Mary's County
County Commissioners
Local Debt (Bond Bills)
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Debt
Revenue and Taxes
St. Mary's County