MD HB97 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Office of Statewide Broadband in the Department of Housing and Community Development to ensure that every resident of the State is supported by high-quality broadband Internet service at an affordable price and has the tools necessary to use and take advantage of the Internet; requiring the Office to develop, by July 1, 2022, a statewide plan to ensure all State residents can connect to reliable broadband Internet by December 31, 2026; establishing the Digital Inclusion Fund to support capacity building in the State; etc.
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Office of Statewide Broadband - Established (Digital Connectivity Act of 2021)
Sponsors
Del. Brooke Lierman [D] | Del. Dalya Attar [D] | Del. Tony Bridges [D] | Del. Shaneka Henson [D] |
Del. Dana Jones [D] | Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D] | Del. Stephanie Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 115 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 115 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2021-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (115-19) |
2021-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-25 | House | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted |
2021-03-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments {703494/1 Adopted |
2021-03-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2021-01-12 | House | Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2020-09-23 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB66 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 74
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appropriations
Auditors and Audits
Boundaries
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Communications
Community Colleges
Counties
Data
Demographics
Disclosure
Economic and Community Development
Education
Education, State Department of
Governor
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Industry and Technology
Information Technology, Department of
Internet Access
Investigations and Inquiries
Jurisdiction
Libraries
Maps and Charts
Names
Planning, Department of
Prices
Privatization
Public Information
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rural Areas
School Administration
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Transportation, Department of
Appropriations
Auditors and Audits
Boundaries
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Communications
Community Colleges
Counties
Data
Demographics
Disclosure
Economic and Community Development
Education
Education, State Department of
Governor
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Industry and Technology
Information Technology, Department of
Internet Access
Investigations and Inquiries
Jurisdiction
Libraries
Maps and Charts
Names
Planning, Department of
Prices
Privatization
Public Information
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rural Areas
School Administration
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Transportation, Department of
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 13 | 504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 5 | 1102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 5 | 107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 6.5 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 6.5 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 6.5 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 6.5 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 6.5 | 105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 6.5 | 106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 6.5 | 107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |