MD HB973 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the eligibility of certain sources of energy in Baltimore City for the creation of credits under the renewable energy portfolio standard; providing that existing obligations or contract rights may not be impaired by the Act; and applying the Act to all renewable energy portfolio standard compliance years beginning after December 31, 2019.
Title
Baltimore City - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Ineligible Tier 1 Sources
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn |
2019-03-01 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |