MD HB978 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a physician, except under certain circumstances, from performing or inducing an abortion on a pregnant woman before determining whether the fetus has a detectable heartbeat and if the physician determines that the fetus has a detectable heartbeat; requiring a physician to use a certain method for detecting a fetal heartbeat under certain circumstances; requiring a physician to include certain information in a woman's medical record under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Abortions - Detection of Fetal Heartbeat (Keep Our Hearts Beating Act)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2019-02-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-19 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Abortion
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Discipline
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Equipment
Examinations
Fines
Health
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Liability
Licenses
Medical Treatments
Penalties and Sentences
Physicians
Pregnancy
Public Health
Records
Rules and Regulations
Time
Women
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Discipline
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Equipment
Examinations
Fines
Health
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Liability
Licenses
Medical Treatments
Penalties and Sentences
Physicians
Pregnancy
Public Health
Records
Rules and Regulations
Time
Women