MD HB98 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 403
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 403
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the termination date of the Maryland Higher Education Outreach and College Access Pilot Program; providing that one of the purposes of the Program is to increase the number of low-income students attending and succeeding in college; altering the title of the Program; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $200,000 for the Program; and altering the reporting dates of a certain report on the Program.
Title
Maryland Higher Education Outreach and College Access Pilot Program - Alterations (Maryland College Access Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 403 |
2021-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (125-0) |
2021-02-11 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-05 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2021-01-04 | House | Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2020-10-15 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Governor
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Local Government Mandates
Reports
Sunset
Time
Budgets
Governor
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Local Government Mandates
Reports
Sunset
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2015 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Chapter of the Acts | 2018 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Education | 11 | 1101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 11 | 1102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 11 | 1103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 11 | 1104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 11 | 1105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 11 | 1106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 11 | 1107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |