MD HB998 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 402
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 402
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Transferring oversight of the Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants from the Office of Student Financial Assistance within the Maryland Higher Education Commission to the Maryland Department of Health; requiring the Department to submit a certain annual report to the General Assembly; requiring the Comptroller to distribute $1,000,000 from the Board of Physicians Fund to the Program if the Governor does not include the funds in the State budget in fiscal year 2022; etc.
Title
Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants - Administration and Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 402 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-14 | House | Floor Amendment {553226/1 (Delegate Reznik) Adopted |
2020-03-14 | House | Floor Amendment {183120/1 (Delegate B. Barnes) Adopted |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {604166/1 Adopted |
2020-03-13 | House | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {604166/1 |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2020-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-05 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB501 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 403
Subjects
Appropriations
Boundaries
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Demographics
Disclosure
Fees
Grants
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Higher Education Commission
Loans
Medical Assistance
Physician Assistants
Physicians
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Boundaries
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Demographics
Disclosure
Fees
Grants
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Higher Education Commission
Loans
Medical Assistance
Physician Assistants
Physicians
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 18 | 2801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 2802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 2803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 2804 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 2805 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 2806 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 24 | 1701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 24 | 1702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 24 | 1703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 24 | 1704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 24 | 1705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 24 | 1706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 24 | 1707 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 14 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 15 | 206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |