MD HJ1 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HJ3
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Opposing certain inspection rules promulgated by the U.S. Department of Agriculture that have drastically impeded the harvest and sale of blue catfish and thus rendered the State unable to adequately use the commercial harvest as a form of control over the invasive blue catfish species; urging the U.S. Congress to amend 21 U.S.C. § 601(w) to exempt the wild catch of domestic catfish from certain inspection requirements; and requiring a copy of the Resolution to be forwarded to certain elected officials.
Title
Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish
Sponsors
Del. Dana Stein [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2021-04-10 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2021-02-17 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 9:30 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2020-09-25 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SJ4 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 1
HJ3 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/24 at 2:00 p.m.
HJ3 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/24 at 2:00 p.m.
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Agriculture
Aquaculture
Chesapeake Bay
Clams
Commerce and Business
Crabs
Environmental Health
Federal Government
Fish and Fishing
Hunting and Fishing
Inspections
Nuisances
Oysters
Agriculture
Aquaculture
Chesapeake Bay
Clams
Commerce and Business
Crabs
Environmental Health
Federal Government
Fish and Fishing
Hunting and Fishing
Inspections
Nuisances
Oysters