MD HJ5 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-15 - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Rejecting items included in the Resolution of the General Assembly Compensation Commission dated January 5, 2010, and transmitted to the General Assembly on January 12, 2010, that address proposed changes to salaries for the President of the Senate, the Speaker of the House of Delegates, and members of the General Assembly, in-district travel, out-of-state travel, and the Legislative Pension Plan for members of the General Assembly; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General Assembly Compensation Commission - Recommendations

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-15 First Reading Budget and Taxation
2010-02-12 Third Reading Passed (129-0)
2010-02-12 Motion Recommit to Committee Rejected (36-94)
2010-02-12 Motion vote previous question (Delegate Ross) Adopted
2010-02-12 Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Frank)
2010-02-10 Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate O'Donnell) Rejected (41-59)
2010-02-10 Second Reading Passed
2010-02-10 Favorable Report Adopted
2010-02-08 Favorable Report by Appropriations
2010-02-02 Hearing 2/4 at 12:30 p.m.
2010-02-01 First Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback