MD HJ5 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-11 - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizing the hour from 8:30 p.m to 9:30 p.m. on March 26, 2011, as Earth Hour; urging Marylanders to observe Earth Hour; and urging the Governor to order that the lights in Government House and the State Capitol complex be turned off during Earth Hour.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolution on Earth Hour

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-11 Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
2011-03-09 Hearing 3/21 at 2:00 p.m.
2011-02-07 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback