MD HJ9 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-6)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Designating June 28 as Freedom of the Press Day in Maryland to memorialize the lives lost on June 28, 2018, at the Capital Gazette offices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Freedom of the Press Day

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseSigned by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 1
2019-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-08SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-04-04SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-28SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-03-27HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-03-26HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-26HouseFavorable with Amendments {283524/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-25HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-11HouseHearing 3/22 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-03-04HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback