MD SB10 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing a duplicative provision of law requiring a person to obtain a tidal fish license to catch certain oysters or clams for commercial purposes; altering the area within which a person is authorized to catch hard-shell clams using certain equipment from the State waters of Worcester County to the State waters of the Atlantic Ocean; prohibiting a person from catching hard-shell clams with certain equipment within 300 feet of any shore or wharf without first obtaining the permission of the shore or wharf owner; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural Resources - Oysters, Clams, and Clamming - Licenses and Regulations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 81
2019-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-03-29HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-29HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-29HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-03-12HouseHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-27HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2019-02-26SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2019-02-22SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-22SenateFavorable with Amendments {804831/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-21SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-09SenateHearing 1/17 at 3:00 p.m.
2019-01-09SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-10-02SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback