MD SB1000 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing the Handgun Permit Review Board in the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services; providing the process by which a person who is denied a certain handgun permit or renewal of a permit or whose permit is revoked or limited by the Secretary of State Police may appeal the decision to the Office of Administration hearings in a certain manner; requiring the Office of Administrative hearings to make a certain annual report to the Governor and the General Assembly by January 1, 2019, through January 1, 2022; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Safety - Handgun Permit Review Board - Repeal

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (87-47) (Y: 87 N: 47 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {773928/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (48-92) (Y: 48 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {633326/1 (Delegate Shoemaker) Rejected (45-95) (Y: 45 N: 95 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (30-16) (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {373224/1 (Senator Beidle) Adopted (29-16) (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {513228/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (17-29) (Y: 18 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Re-referred Executive Nominations Judicial Proceedings Adopted (31-15) (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateVetoed by the Governor (Policy)
2019-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (87-47)
2019-04-04HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-04HouseFloor Amendment {633326/1 (Delegate Shoemaker) Rejected (45-95)
2019-04-04HouseFloor Amendment {773928/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (48-92)
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2019-03-27HouseHearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-26HouseRereferred to Judiciary
2019-03-26HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-25SenateThird Reading Passed (30-16)
2019-03-22SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-22SenateFloor Amendment {153929/1 (Senator Beidle) Adopted
2019-03-22SenateFloor Amendment {223823/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
2019-03-22SenateSpecial Order until later today (Senator Beidle) Adopted
2019-03-22SenateFloor Amendment {223823/1 (Senator Hershey)
2019-03-22SenateFloor Amendment {503325/2 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
2019-03-22SenateFloor Amendment {503325/1 (Senator Jennings) Withdrawn
2019-03-22SenateSpecial Order until later today (Senator Jennings) Adopted
2019-03-22SenateFloor Amendment {503325/1 (Senator Jennings)
2019-03-22SenateFloor Amendment {513228/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (17-29)
2019-03-22SenateFloor Amendment {373224/1 (Senator Beidle) Adopted (29-16)
2019-03-21SenateLaid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
2019-03-21SenateFloor Amendment {373224/1 (Senator Beidle)
2019-03-21SenateFavorable with Amendments {243223/2 Report Adopted
2019-03-20SenateSpecial Order until 3/21 (Senator Miller) Adopted
2019-03-20SenateFavorable with Amendments {243223/2
2019-03-20SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Executive Nominations
2019-03-01SenateHearing 3/08 at 9:00 a.m. (Executive Nominations)
2019-02-28SenateMotion Re-referred Executive Nominations Judicial Proceedings Adopted (31-15)
2019-02-27SenateSpecial Order until 2/28 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
2019-02-27SenateRereferred to Executive Nominations and Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-21SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb1000&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb1000f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb1000t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb1000_24322302.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb1000_37322401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb1000_50332501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb1000_51322801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb1000_15392901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb1000_22382301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb1000_50332502.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb1000_63332601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb1000_77392801.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0321.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0000/sb1000.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb1000_exn.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb1000_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0733.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0734.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0775.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb1000_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1228.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1229.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1305.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/veto_letters/sb1000.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback