MD SB1001 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Comptroller to distribute the sales and use tax revenue on the sale or use of certain digital products to The Blueprint for Maryland's Future Fund; defining "digital product" as one that is obtained electronically by the buyer or delivered by certain means; applying the sales and use tax to a sale or use of certain digital products; providing that the retail sale of a certain digital code or digital product shall be presumed to be made in the state in which a certain customer tax address is located; etc.
Title
21st–Century Economy Fairness Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Floor Committee Amendment {149233/3 Adopted |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {999231/1 Adopted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Serafini) Adopted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {999231/1 |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2020-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
HB932 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Subjects
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Cable Television
Comptroller
internet
Motion Pictures
News Media
Prices
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Sales and Use Tax
Taxes - Sales and Use
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Television
Video
Cable Television
Comptroller
internet
Motion Pictures
News Media
Prices
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Sales and Use Tax
Taxes - Sales and Use
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Television
Video
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 11 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 11 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 11 | 217 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 11 | 221 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 2 | 1302.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |