MD SB1004 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 770
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the date by which the Clerk of the Court of Appeals and the Clerk of the Court of Special Appeals must provide a certain notice to the State Board of Elections; repealing the requirement that the Anne Arundel County Board of Education provide a certain notice to the State Board; altering the deadline for the filing of a certain certificate of candidacy; altering the deadline for the filing of a certain petition to challenge a certain candidate's residency; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Law - Election Calendar and Processes - Revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 770
2019-04-05SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-05SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments {125162/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-03-19HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-19HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2019-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-14SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-14SenateFavorable with Amendments {554131/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-14SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-27SenateHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-27SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-22SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb1004&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb1004f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb1004t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb1004e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_770_sb1004e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/sb1004_55413101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/sb1004_12516201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0004/sb1004.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb1004_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0619.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb1004_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1191.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1222.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback