MD SB1006 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 122
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 122
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a condition relating to an incarcerated obligor's term of imprisonment under which the obligor's child support payment is not considered past due and arrearages will not accrue if the obligor was sentenced to a term of imprisonment of 180 consecutive calendar days or more.
Title
Child Support - Suspension of Payments and Arrears for Incarcerated Obligors - Modifications
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Carter [D] | Sen. Shelly Hettleman [D] | Sen. William Smith [D] | Sen. Charles Sydnor [D] |
Sen. Chris West [R] | Sen. Ronald Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 102 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 114 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 102 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 114 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 122 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (102-32) |
2020-03-18 | House | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (114-21) |
2020-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {202111/1 Adopted |
2020-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2020-03-16 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Family Law | 12 | 104.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |