MD SB1009 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program, subject to the limitations of the State budget, to provide coverage for acupuncture services administered by health care practitioners who are licensed under Title 1A of the Health Occupations Article and operating within the scope of practice of the practitioner.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Coverage - Acupuncture Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20SenateUnfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
2019-03-19SenateHearing canceled
2019-03-08SenateHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-05SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-26SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback